There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Amended by Senate

A bill to designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 120 12th Street Lobby in Columbus, Georgia, as the "Richard W. Williams, Jr., Chapter of the Triple Nickles (555th P.I.A.) Post Office".

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 120 12th Street Lobby in Columbus, Georgia, as the "Richard W. Williams Chapter of the Triple Nickles (555th P.I.A.) Post Office".


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
12/14/2018Became Public Law No: 115-319. (TXT | PDF)
12/14/2018Signed by President.
12/13/2018Presented to President.
12/11/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H10082)
12/11/2018Committee on Oversight and Government discharged.
11/15/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7063; text: CR S7063)
09/28/2018Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with amendments and an amendment to the title. Without written report.
07/18/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/14/2018Became Public Law No: 115-319. (TXT | PDF)
12/14/2018Signed by President.
12/13/2018SenatePresented to President.
12/11/2018-4:20pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/11/2018-4:20pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H10082)
12/11/2018-4:20pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H10082)
12/11/2018HouseCommittee on Oversight and Government discharged.
12/11/2018-4:19pmHouseMr. Mitchell asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
11/20/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
11/20/2018-10:33amHouseReceived in the House.
11/16/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/15/2018SenatePassed Senate with amendments and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7063; text: CR S7063)
09/28/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 589.
09/28/2018SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with amendments and an amendment to the title. Without written report.
09/26/2018SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
07/18/2018SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 07/18/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs07/18/2018 Referred to
09/26/2018 Markup by
09/28/2018 Reported by
House Oversight and Government Reform11/20/2018 Referred to
12/11/2018 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for S.3237.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.3237. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-319 (12/14/2018)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 120 12th Street Lobby in Columbus, Georgia, as the "Richard W. Williams, Jr., Chapter of the Triple Nickles (555th P.I.A.) Post Office."