There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

State Veterans Home Adult Day Health Care Improvement Act of 2017

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

State Veterans Home Adult Day Health Care Improvement Act of 2017

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

State Veterans Home Adult Day Health Care Improvement Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to improve the provision of adult day health care services for veterans.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
03/27/2018Became Public Law No: 115-159. (TXT | PDF)
03/27/2018Signed by President.
03/19/2018Presented to President.
03/13/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H1513)
11/09/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S7164)
11/09/2017Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
02/07/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
03/27/2018Became Public Law No: 115-159. (TXT | PDF)
03/27/2018Signed by President.
03/19/2018SenatePresented to President.
03/13/2018-5:00pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/13/2018-5:00pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1513)
03/13/2018-4:45pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 324.
03/13/2018-4:45pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1513-1515)
03/13/2018-4:45pmHouseMr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
11/13/2017-6:30pmHouseHeld at the desk.
11/13/2017-2:04pmHouseReceived in the House.
11/13/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/09/2017SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S7164)
11/09/2017SenateS.Amdt.1581 Amendment SA 1581 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
11/09/2017SenateS.Amdt.1581 Amendment SA 1581 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Hatch. (consideration: CR S7163-7164; text: CR S7164) In the nature of a substitute.
11/09/2017SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7163-7164)
11/09/2017SenateSenate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
05/17/2017SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-299.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
02/07/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Veterans' Affairs02/07/2017 Referred to
05/17/2017 Hearings by
11/09/2017 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.324. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-159 (03/27/2018)

State Veterans Home Adult Day Health Care Improvement Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to enter into an agreement with each state home to pay for medical supervision model adult day health care for a veteran for whom the home is not receiving VA nursing home care payments. Such payment shall constitute payment in full for such care.

The veteran must need such care either specifically for a service-connected disability, or, if not specifically for one, the veteran must have a service-connected disability rated 70% or more.

The payment rate under each VA-state home agreement for a veteran shall be established through regulations prescribed by the VA to adequately reimburse the home for the care, including necessary transportation expenses. Such rate shall not take effect until 30 days after the date on which the regulations are published in the Federal Register. Until such time, the initial rate shall equal 65% of the payment that the VA would otherwise pay to the state home if the veteran were receiving nursing home care.

"Medical supervision model adult day health care" means adult day health care that includes the coordination of physician services, dental services, nursing services, the administration of drugs, and such other requirements as the VA may determine.