There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Women's Entrepreneurship and Economic Empowerment Act of 2018

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Women's Entrepreneurship and Economic Empowerment Act of 2018

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Women's Entrepreneurship and Economic Empowerment Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Women's Entrepreneurship and Economic Empowerment Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Women's Entrepreneurship and Economic Empowerment Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to improve programs and activities relating to women's entrepreneurship and economic empowerment that are carried out by the United States Agency for International Development, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
01/09/2019Became Public Law No: 115-428. (TXT | PDF)
01/09/2019Signed by President.
01/02/2019Presented to President.
12/21/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 352 - 18 (Roll no. 492).(text: CR H10550-10552)
12/19/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
11/28/2018Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
07/19/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/09/2019Became Public Law No: 115-428. (TXT | PDF)
01/09/2019Signed by President.
01/02/2019SenatePresented to President.
12/21/2018-4:44pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/21/2018-4:44pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 352 - 18 (Roll no. 492). (text: CR H10550-10552)
12/21/2018-4:40pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10576-10577)
12/21/2018-11:09amHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/21/2018-11:04amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3247.
12/21/2018-11:04amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10550-10553)
12/21/2018-11:04amHouseMr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/19/2018-9:21pmHouseHeld at the desk.
12/19/2018-8:00pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/19/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/19/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
11/28/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 683.
11/28/2018SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
11/28/2018SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
07/19/2018SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Cosponsors (12)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Foreign Relations07/19/2018 Referred to
11/28/2018 Markup by
11/28/2018 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.3247. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-428 (01/09/2019)

Women's Entrepreneurship and Economic Empowerment Act of 2018

This bill modifies U.S. Agency for International Development (USAID) programs to provide targeted assistance for women.

USAID strategies and projects shall be shaped by analysis to address gender differences, including how results may be different for men and women due to issues such as gender roles and structural barriers.

The President is authorized to provide programs in developing countries for micro, small, and medium-sized businesses, particularly those owned, managed, and controlled by women. Previously, authorization for such programs was largely limited to microenterprises. The President is also authorized to provide targeted assistance programs that promote economic empowerment of women, including through increased access to financial resources, improving property and inheritance rights, and other legal protections.

For sustainable poverty-focused programs, half of resources targeting micro, small, and medium-sized enterprises shall be for activities that reach the very poor. Half of resources for programs for small and medium-sized enterprises shall be for activities targeting enterprises owned, managed, or controlled by women.

The bill directs USAID to modify its system for monitoring its programs to include outcomes broken down by gender, when feasible.

The President is authorized to expand the micro and small business development credit program to provide such assistance to medium-sized businesses as well.

The bill also directs USAID to break down various information in its annual report by gender and income level. USAID shall also report to Congress on the implementation of this bill. The Government Accountability Office shall report to Congress an assessment of the effect of development assistance for micro, small, and medium-sized enterprises in developing countries, and the extent to which such aid benefits women and the very poor.