There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

STOP Using Human Shields Act
Sanction Terrorist Operations Using Human Shields Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to impose sanctions on foreign persons responsible for serious violations of international law regarding the protection of civilians during armed conflict, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
10/03/2018Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
07/24/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date
10/03/2018Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 618.
Action By: Senate
10/03/2018Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Relations
09/26/2018Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Relations
07/24/2018Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (51)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN]* 07/24/2018
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 07/24/2018
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 07/24/2018
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC]* 07/24/2018
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 07/24/2018
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 07/24/2018
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA]* 07/24/2018
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR] 07/26/2018
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 07/30/2018
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 07/31/2018
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/31/2018
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS] 07/31/2018
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 08/01/2018
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 08/01/2018
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 08/15/2018
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 08/15/2018
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 08/15/2018
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 08/16/2018
Sen. Young, Todd C. [R-IN] 08/16/2018
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 08/21/2018
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 08/21/2018
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 08/22/2018
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/05/2018
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 09/12/2018
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 09/12/2018
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 09/12/2018
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 09/12/2018
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 09/12/2018
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 09/12/2018
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 09/12/2018
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 09/12/2018
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 09/17/2018
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 09/17/2018
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 09/17/2018
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 09/17/2018
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 09/17/2018
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 09/24/2018
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 09/24/2018
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 09/24/2018
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 09/24/2018
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 09/25/2018
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 09/25/2018
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 09/26/2018
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 09/26/2018
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 10/02/2018
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 10/03/2018
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 10/05/2018
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 10/05/2018
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 10/09/2018
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 10/10/2018
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 10/11/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations07/24/2018 Referred to
09/26/2018 Markup by
10/03/2018 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.