There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Space Frontier Act of 2019

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Space Frontier Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Space Frontier Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to reduce regulatory burdens and streamline processes related to commercial space activities, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
12/21/2018Failed of passage/not agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 239 - 137 (Roll no. 485).(text: CR H10560-10566)
12/20/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7966-7970; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S7966-7970)
11/29/2018Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-397.
07/25/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/21/2018-4:19pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 239 - 137 (Roll no. 485). (text: CR H10560-10566)
12/21/2018-4:16pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10572)
12/21/2018-11:48amHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/21/2018-11:40amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3277.
12/21/2018-11:40amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10560-10567)
12/21/2018-11:39amHouseMr. Smith (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/20/2018-6:01pmHouseHeld at the desk.
12/20/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/20/2018-3:47pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/20/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7966-7970; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S7966-7970)
12/20/2018SenateS.Amdt.4176 Amendment SA 4176 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
12/20/2018SenateS.Amdt.4176 Amendment SA 4176 proposed by Senator Cruz. (consideration: CR S7900) In the nature of a substitute.
12/20/2018SenateThe committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent.
12/20/2018SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
11/29/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 686.
11/29/2018SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-397.
08/01/2018SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
07/25/2018SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 07/25/2018
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 07/25/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation07/25/2018 Referred to
08/01/2018 Markup by
11/29/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-397

No related bill information was received for S.3277.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.3277. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (07/25/2018)

Space Frontier Act of 2018

The bill revises provisions relating to commercial space launch license applications and experimental permits.

The Department of Transportation shall consolidate across federal agencies requirements to protect the public health and safety, safety of property, national security interests, and foreign policy interests of the United States relevant to any commercial space vehicle into a single application set that satisfies those requirements and expedites the coordination of commercial space services.

The bill revises and sets forth provisions relating to nongovernmental earth observation activities.

NASA must ensure that the International Space Station remains a viable and productive facility capable of potential U.S. use through at least FY2030.