There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Missing Children's Assistance Act of 2018

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Missing Children's Assistance Act of 2018

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Missing Children's Assistance Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Missing Children's Assistance Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Missing Children's Assistance Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Missing Children's Assistance Act, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
10/11/2018Became Public Law No: 115-267. (TXT | PDF)
10/11/2018Signed by President.
10/02/2018Presented to President.
09/28/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H9358-9359)
09/27/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/18/2018Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley without amendment. Without written report.
08/16/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
10/11/2018Became Public Law No: 115-267. (TXT | PDF)
10/11/2018Signed by President.
10/02/2018SenatePresented to President.
09/28/2018-12:29pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/28/2018-12:29pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H9358-9359)
09/28/2018-12:29pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9358-9359)
09/28/2018-12:29pmHouseMr. Guthrie asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
09/28/2018-11:25amHouseHeld at the desk.
09/28/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/28/2018-11:11amHouseReceived in the House.
09/27/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/27/2018SenateS.Amdt.4024 Amendment SA 4024 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
09/27/2018SenateS.Amdt.4024 Amendment SA 4024 proposed by Senator Perdue for Senator Grassley. (consideration: CR S6364) In the nature of a substitute.
09/27/2018SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6364)
09/18/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 583.
09/18/2018SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley without amendment. Without written report.
09/13/2018SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
08/16/2018SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S5694)

Cosponsors (9)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary08/16/2018 Referred to
09/13/2018 Markup by
09/18/2018 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.3354. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-267 (10/11/2018)

Missing Children's Assistance Act of 2018

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Missing Children's Assistance Act:

  • to revise the definition of "missing child" to mean an individual under 18 years of age whose whereabouts are unknown to the individual's parent (currently, legal custodian),
  • to specify that a parent includes a legal guardian or an individual who functions as a parent (e.g., a grandparent),
  • to revise the functions and duties of the National Center on Missing and Exploited Children (NCMEC), and
  • to require the NCMEC to make publicly available the annual report on missing children and the incidence of attempted child abductions.

(Sec. 3) The bill reauthorizes through FY2023 the following:

  • programs and activities for missing and exploited children, and
  • audit requirements for grant recipients.