There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Military Widow's Tax Elimination Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 10, United States Code, to repeal the requirement for reduction of survivor annuities under the Survivor Benefit Plan by veterans' dependency and indemnity compensation, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/07/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
02/07/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (51)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 02/07/2017
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 03/01/2017
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 03/01/2017
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 03/01/2017
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 03/01/2017
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR] 03/01/2017
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 03/01/2017
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 03/01/2017
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 03/01/2017
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/06/2017
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 03/06/2017
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 03/06/2017
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/07/2017
Sen. Strange, Luther [R-AL] 03/13/2017
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 03/27/2017
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 04/03/2017
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 04/03/2017
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 04/04/2017
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 04/07/2017
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 04/07/2017
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 04/07/2017
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 04/24/2017
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 04/24/2017
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/24/2017
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 04/25/2017
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 04/25/2017
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 04/27/2017
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 04/27/2017
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 05/15/2017
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 05/16/2017
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/22/2017
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA] 06/05/2017
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 07/26/2017
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 10/05/2017
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 10/30/2017
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 10/31/2017
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 02/07/2018
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 02/14/2018
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 04/18/2018
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 05/07/2018
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 05/23/2018
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 06/06/2018
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 06/11/2018
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 06/11/2018
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 06/12/2018
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/12/2018
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS] 06/21/2018
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 06/25/2018
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 07/18/2018
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 07/24/2018
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 10/05/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Armed Services02/07/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.339. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/07/2017)

Military Widow's Tax Elimination Act of 2017

This bill repeals certain provisions which require the offset of amounts paid in dependency and indemnity compensation from Survivor Benefit Plan (SBP) annuities for the surviving spouses of former military personnel who are entitled to military retired pay or who would be entitled to such pay, except for being under 60 years of age.

The Department of Defense is prohibited from recouping certain amounts previously paid to SBP recipients in the form of a retired pay refund.

The bill requires (current law authorizes) the Secretary of the military department concerned to pay an annuity to a member's dependent children when there is no eligible surviving spouse. The Secretary concerned shall restore annuity eligibility to a surviving spouse who earlier agreed to transfer such eligibility to the surviving child or children of a member.