There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Midnight Rules Relief Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Midnight Rules Relief Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, to provide for the en bloc consideration in resolutions of disapproval for "midnight rules", and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
10/05/2017 Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. With written report No. 115-164. Minority views filed.
01/05/2017 Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date
10/05/2017 Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 233.
Action By: Senate
10/05/2017 Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. With written report No. 115-164. Minority views filed.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs
05/17/2017 Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs
01/05/2017 Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 03/13/2017
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 03/13/2017
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 03/13/2017
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 03/14/2017
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 03/15/2017
Sen. Strange, Luther [R-AL] 06/20/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs01/05/2017 Referred to
05/17/2017 Markup by
10/05/2017 Reported by S. Rept. 115-164

Related Bills (2)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (6)

  • Administrative law and regulatory procedures
  • Congressional oversight
  • Legislative rules and procedure
  • Presidential administrations
  • Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.34. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/05/2017)

Midnight Rules Relief Act of 2017

This bill amends the Congressional Review Act to allow Congress to consider a joint resolution to disapprove multiple regulations that federal agencies have submitted for congressional review within the last 60 legislative days of a session of Congress during the final year of a President's term. Congress may disapprove a group of such regulations together (i.e., "en bloc") instead of the current procedure of considering only one regulation at a time.