There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Protecting and Securing Chemical Facilities from Terrorist Attacks Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Protecting and Securing Chemical Facilities from Terrorist Attacks Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to reauthorize the Chemical Facility Anti-Terrorism Standards Program of the Department of Homeland Security.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
11/26/2018Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-384.
09/04/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date
11/26/2018Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 670.
Action By: Senate
11/26/2018Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-384.
09/28/2018Star Print ordered on the bill.
Action By: Senate
09/26/2018Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
09/04/2018Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 10/10/2018
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 11/13/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs09/04/2018 Referred to
09/26/2018 Markup by
11/26/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-384

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.