There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

RESPECT Act
Repealing Existing Substandard Provisions Encouraging Conciliation with Tribes

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

RESPECT Act
Repealing Existing Substandard Provisions Encouraging Conciliation with Tribes Act

Short Titles as Introduced

RESPECT Act
Repealing Existing Substandard Provisions Encouraging Conciliation with Tribes Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to repeal certain obsolete laws relating to Indians.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
11/29/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7497; text: CR S7497)
05/24/2017Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 115-85.
02/08/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/04/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
11/30/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
11/30/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/30/2017-2:55pmHouseReceived in the House.
11/29/2017SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7497; text: CR S7497)
05/24/2017SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 105.
05/24/2017SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 115-85.
03/29/2017SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
02/08/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK]* 02/08/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Indian Affairs02/08/2017 Referred to
03/29/2017 Markup by
05/24/2017 Reported by S. Rept. 115-85
House Natural Resources11/30/2017 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs12/04/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.343.


Subjects (2)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.343. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (11/29/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the Senate reported version is repeated here.)

Repealing Existing Substandard Provisions Encouraging Conciliation with Tribes Act or the RESPECT Act

(Sec. 2) This bill repeals outdated provisions regarding treatment of Native Americans, including provisions on hostile tribes, alcohol, work requirements, penalties for truancy, and placement of youth in reform school without the consent of a parent or guardian.