There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

National Volcano Early Warning and Monitoring System Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

National Volcano Early Warning and Monitoring System Act

Short Titles as Introduced

National Volcano Early Warning and Monitoring System Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for the establishment of the National Volcano Early Warning and Monitoring System.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/17/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote.(text as passed Senate: CR S3777-3778)
06/15/2017Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with amendments. With written report No. 115-113.
02/08/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
05/21/2018-3:37pmHouseHeld at the desk.
05/21/2018-2:03pmHouseReceived in the House.
05/21/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/17/2018SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote. (text as passed Senate: CR S3777-3778)
05/17/2018SenateS.Amdt.2252 Amendment SA 2252 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
05/17/2018SenateS.Amdt.2252 Amendment SA 2252 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Murkowski. (consideration: CR S2777; text: CR S2777) To modify the authorization of appropriations.
05/17/2018SenateThe committee amendments agreed to by Unanimous Consent. (text of measure as reported to Senate: CR S3776-3777)
05/17/2018SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S3776-3778)
06/15/2017SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 150.
06/15/2017SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with amendments. With written report No. 115-113.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
03/30/2017SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
02/08/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S968-969)

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 02/08/2017
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 02/08/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources02/08/2017 Referred to
03/30/2017 Markup by
06/15/2017 Reported by S. Rept. 115-113

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.346. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (06/15/2017)

National Volcano Early Warning and Monitoring System Act

(Sec. 3) This bill directs the United States Geological Survey (USGS) to establish the National Volcano Early Warning and Monitoring System to monitor, issue warnings of, and protect U.S. citizens from undue and avoidable harm from, volcanic activity.

The purposes of the system are to: (1) organize, modernize, standardize, and stabilize the monitoring systems of U.S. volcano observatories; and (2) unify such systems into a single interoperative system. The objective of the system is to monitor all U.S. volcanoes at a level commensurate with the threat posed by the volcanoes by: (1) upgrading existing networks on monitored volcanoes, (2) installing new networks on unmonitored volcanoes, and (3) employing geodetic and other components when applicable.

The system shall include: (1) a national volcano watch office that is operational 24 hours a day and 7 days a week, (2) a national volcano data center, (3) an external grants program to support research in volcano monitoring science and technology, and (4) modernization activities including the comprehensive application of emerging technologies.

The USGS must: (1) submit to Congress a five-year management plan for establishing and operating the system, (2) establish an advisory committee to assist in implementing the system, and (3) report to Congress annually describing the activities carried out under this bill.

The USGS may enter into cooperative agreements designating institutions of higher education and state agencies as volcano observatory partners for the system.

(Sec. 4) The bill authorizes appropriations to carry out this bill for FY2017-FY2027.