There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Black Hills National Cemetery Boundary Expansion Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Black Hills National Cemetery Boundary Expansion Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Black Hills National Cemetery Boundary Expansion Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Black Hills National Cemetery Boundary Expansion Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Black Hills National Cemetery Boundary Expansion Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Black Hills National Cemetery Boundary Expansion Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to transfer administrative jurisdiction over certain Bureau of Land Management land from the Secretary of the Interior to the Secretary of Veterans Affairs for inclusion in the Black Hills National Cemetery, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
05/25/2018Became Public Law No: 115-175.
05/25/2018Signed by President.
05/21/2018Presented to President.
05/16/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 407 - 0 (Roll no. 187).(text: CR 5/16/2018 H3951-3952)
04/10/2018Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged.
04/10/2018Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-626, Part I.
12/21/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S8267-8269; text: CR S8267-8268)
05/03/2017Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-35.
01/05/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (26)

Date Chamber
05/25/2018Became Public Law No: 115-175.
05/25/2018Signed by President.
05/21/2018SenatePresented to President.
05/16/2018-3:11pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/16/2018-3:11pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 407 - 0 (Roll no. 187). (text: CR 5/16/2018 H3951-3952)
05/16/2018-3:03pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (CR H4008)
05/15/2018-5:24pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
05/15/2018-5:17pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 35.
05/15/2018-5:17pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3951-3953)
05/15/2018-5:17pmHouseMr. Bishop (UT) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
04/10/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 479.
04/10/2018HouseCommittee on Veterans' Affairs discharged.
04/10/2018HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-626, Part I.
03/14/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
03/14/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/07/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/07/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/07/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
12/22/2017-3:19pmHouseHeld at the desk.
12/22/2017-2:05pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/22/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/21/2017SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S8267-8269; text: CR S8267-8268)
05/03/2017SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 49.
05/03/2017SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-35.
03/30/2017SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
01/05/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD]* 01/05/2017
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 01/05/2017

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources01/05/2017 Referred to
03/30/2017 Markup by
05/03/2017 Reported by S. Rept. 115-35
House Natural Resources03/07/2018 Referred to
03/14/2018 Markup by
04/10/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-626
House Veterans' Affairs03/07/2018 Referred to
04/10/2018 Discharged from
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs03/07/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (6)

There are 6 summaries for S.35. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-175 (05/25/2018)

Black Hills National Cemetery Boundary Expansion Act

(Sec. 3) This bill directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to: (1) complete environmental, cultural resource, and other due diligence activities on certain federal land to confirm its suitability for inclusion in the Black Hills National Cemetery, South Dakota; and (2) notify, and coordinate with, the Department of the Interior regarding such activities.

After completion of such activities and upon receipt by Interior of written confirmation of suitability from the VA, the land shall: (1) be withdrawn from all forms of appropriation under the public land laws, including the mining laws, the mineral leasing laws, and the geothermal leasing laws, for as long as it remains under VA administrative jurisdiction; (2) be treated as property; and (3) be transferred, except for the land within 100 feet of the center of the Centennial Trail, from Interior to the VA for use as a national cemetery.

Interior shall publish a notice containing the legal descriptions of such transferred land.

The VA shall reimburse Interior for reasonable transfer costs, including survey costs.

The cemetery's boundary is modified to include such federal land.