There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Save Our Seas Act of 2018

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Save Our Seas Act of 2018

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Save Our Seas Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Save Our Seas Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to reauthorize and amend the Marine Debris Act to promote international action to reduce marine debris, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
10/11/2018Became Public Law No: 115-265.
10/11/2018Signed by President.
10/02/2018Presented to President.
09/27/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H9135-9138)
09/26/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6330-6334; text: CR S6331-6334)
09/26/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber
10/11/2018Became Public Law No: 115-265.
10/11/2018Signed by President.
10/02/2018SenatePresented to President.
09/27/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/27/2018-4:22pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/27/2018-4:22pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H9135-9138)
09/27/2018-4:21pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9135-9138)
09/27/2018-4:21pmHouseMr. Denham asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
09/27/2018-3:31pmHouseHeld at the desk.
09/27/2018-12:16pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/26/2018SenateIntroduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6330-6334; text: CR S6331-6334)

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 09/26/2018
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 09/26/2018
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 09/26/2018

Committees (0)

As of 05/24/2019 text has not been received for S.3508 - Save Our Seas Act of 2018

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.3508. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (09/26/2018)

Save Our Seas Act of 2018

This bill addresses marine debris and maritime safety issues.

Specifically, the bill amends the Marine Debris Act to reauthorize through FY2022 and revise the Marine Debris Program, including to require the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration to respond to severe marine debris events.

Hamm Alert Maritime Safety Act of 2018

The bill establishes maritime safety requirements, such as requirements concerning vessel inspections, safety equipment, voyage data recorders, oversight of recognized organizations that act on behalf of the Coast Guard, and timely weather forecasts and hazard advisories.

Coast Guard Blue Technology Center of Expertise Act

The U.S. Coast Guard may establish a Blue Technology Center of Expertise to promote awareness about blue technologies and their potential to enhance the Coast Guard's mission readiness and operational performance. Blue technology includes technology that supports maritime domain awareness (e.g., surveillance), search and rescue, emergency response, maritime law enforcement, or protection of the marine environment.