There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Museum and Library Services Act of 2018

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Museum and Library Services Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Museum and Library Services Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to reauthorize the Museum and Library Services Act.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
12/31/2018Became Public Law No: 115-410.
12/31/2018Signed by President.
12/27/2018Presented to President.
12/19/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 331 - 28 (Roll no. 445).(text: CR H10309-10312)
12/04/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7291-7298; text of measure as reported: CR S7292-7295; text of measure as passed: CR S7295-7298)
12/03/2018Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with amendments. Without written report.
09/28/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber
12/31/2018Became Public Law No: 115-410.
12/31/2018Signed by President.
12/27/2018SenatePresented to President.
12/19/2018-7:59pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/19/2018-7:59pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 331 - 28 (Roll no. 445). (text: CR H10309-10312)
12/19/2018-7:51pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10319-10320)
12/19/2018-5:35pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Banks (IN) objected to the Yea - Nay vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn.
12/19/2018-5:28pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3530.
12/19/2018-5:28pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10309-10313)
12/19/2018-5:27pmHouseMr. Banks (IN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/06/2018-2:46pmHouseHeld at the desk.
12/06/2018-12:07pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/06/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/04/2018SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7291-7298; text of measure as reported: CR S7292-7295; text of measure as passed: CR S7295-7298)
12/03/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 707.
12/03/2018SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with amendments. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions
11/29/2018SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Action By: Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions
09/28/2018SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
09/28/2018SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S6389)

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions09/28/2018 Referred to
11/29/2018 Markup by
12/03/2018 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.3530. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-410 (12/31/2018)

Museum and Library Services Act of 2018

This bill amends and reauthorizes through FY2025 the Museum and Library Services Act and provides funding for library services and technology through FY2025.

(Sec. 8) The bill expands the definitions of "library" and "museum" to include a tribal library or museum and expands the services museums are authorized to provide.

(Sec. 19) The Institute of Museum and Library Services, under the 21st Century Museum Professional Program established by this bill, may enter into arrangements with museum, museum consortia and associations, institutions of higher education, and other entities for projects to

  • increase the number of students from diverse and underrepresented backgrounds enrolled in graduate and undergraduate museum-related programs;
  • recruit future museum professionals from such backgrounds;
  • develop new or enhance current professional development and retention programs for museum professionals and the museum workforce; and
  • support and conduct research, needs assessments, pilot programs, and evaluation of education and professional development programs to recruit, prepare, educate, and retain the next generation of museum professionals.