There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to extend the effective date for the sunset for collateral requirements for Small Business Administration disaster loans.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
12/20/2018By Senator Risch from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 115-453.
11/29/2018Became Public Law No: 115-280. (TXT | PDF)
11/29/2018Signed by President.
11/27/2018Presented to President.
11/16/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H9551)
11/15/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7064; text: CR S7064)
10/11/2018Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Reported by Senator Risch without amendment. Without written report.
10/05/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/20/2018SenateBy Senator Risch from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 115-453.
11/29/2018Became Public Law No: 115-280. (TXT | PDF)
11/29/2018Signed by President.
11/27/2018SenatePresented to President.
11/16/2018-11:13amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/16/2018-11:13amHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H9551)
11/16/2018-11:12amHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9551)
11/16/2018-11:12amHouseMr. Chabot asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
11/16/2018-10:40amHouseHeld at the desk.
11/16/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/16/2018-10:07amHouseReceived in the House.
11/15/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7064; text: CR S7064)
10/11/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 631.
10/11/2018SenateCommittee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Reported by Senator Risch without amendment. Without written report.
10/11/2018SenateCommittee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
10/05/2018SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 10/05/2018
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 10/09/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Small Business and Entrepreneurship10/05/2018 Referred to
10/11/2018 Markup by
10/11/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-453

No related bill information was received for S.3554.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.3554. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-280 (11/29/2018)

(Sec. 1) This bill amends the RISE After Disaster Act of 2015 to extend by one year the increased threshold for the minimum major-disaster loan amount for which the Small Business Administration may require collateral.