There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Improving Access to Farm Conservation Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Food Security Act of 1985 to exempt certain recipients of Department of Agriculture conservation assistance from certain reporting requirements, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/13/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
02/13/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 02/13/2017
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 03/27/2017
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/26/2017
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 08/01/2017
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 09/07/2017
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 09/27/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs02/13/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.364. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/13/2017)

Improving Access to Farm Conservation Act of 2017

This bill amends the Food Security Act of 1985 to exempt certain recipients of Department of Agriculture (USDA) conservation assistance from specified reporting requirements. The bill exempts producers or landowners eligible to participate in any USDA conservation program from reporting requirements related to subawards, executive compensation, the Universal Identifier, and the System for Award Management.