There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

First Step Act

Short Titles as Introduced for portions of this bill
  • Lieutenant Osvaldo Albarati Correctional Officer Self-Protection Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for programs to help reduce the risk that prisoners will recidivate upon release from prison, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
11/15/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
11/26/2018Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 674.
Action By: Senate
11/15/2018Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (42)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 11/15/2018
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 11/15/2018
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 11/15/2018
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 11/15/2018
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ]* 11/15/2018
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC]* 11/15/2018
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 11/15/2018
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA]* 11/15/2018
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 11/15/2018
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 11/15/2018
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 11/15/2018
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 11/26/2018
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 11/26/2018
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 11/26/2018
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 11/26/2018
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 11/26/2018
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 11/26/2018
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 11/26/2018
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 11/26/2018
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 11/27/2018
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 11/27/2018
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 11/27/2018
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 11/27/2018
Sen. Young, Todd C. [R-IN] 11/28/2018
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 11/28/2018
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 11/29/2018
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 11/29/2018
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 12/05/2018
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 12/05/2018
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 12/06/2018
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 12/06/2018
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 12/10/2018
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 12/10/2018
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 12/12/2018
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 12/12/2018
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 12/13/2018
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 12/13/2018
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 12/18/2018
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 12/18/2018
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 12/18/2018
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 12/18/2018
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 12/18/2018

Committees (0)

As of 04/22/2021 text has not been received for S.3649 - First Step Act

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.3649. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (11/15/2018)

First Step Act

This bill amends various provisions of law and sets forth new provisions:

  • to require the Department of Justice to establish and the Bureau of Prisons (BOP) to implement a risk and needs assessment system;
  • to modify the computation of good time credit;
  • to allow federal correctional officers to securely store and carry concealed firearms on BOP premises outside the security perimeter of a prison;
  • to limit the use of restraints on federal prisoners who are pregnant or in postpartum recovery;
  • to reduce mandatory minimum prison terms for certain nonviolent repeat drug offenses;
  • to broaden the existing safety valve to permit a sentence below the mandatory minimum for certain nonviolent, cooperative drug offenders with a limited criminal history;
  • to make the Fair Sentencing Act of 2010 retroactive;
  • to require prisoners to be placed within 500 miles of their primary residence;
  • to require low-risk prisoners to be placed on home confinement for the maximum amount of time permitted;
  • to reauthorize through FY2022 and modify eligibility for an elderly offender early release pilot program;
  • to require the BOP to help prisoners obtain identification documents prior to release, to incorporate de-escalation procedures into training programs, and to make tampons and sanitary napkins available free of charge;
  • to authorize Federal Prison Industries to sell products to additional markets;
  • to require probation and pretrial services officers to perform court-directed supervision of sex offenders conditionally released from civil commitment;
  • to require the BOP to establish pilot programs on youth mentorship and service to abandoned, rescued, or vulnerable animals; and
  • to limit juvenile solitary confinement.