There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

TAILOR Act of 2017
Taking Account of Institutions with Low Operation Risk Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require the Federal financial institutions regulatory agencies to take risk profiles and business models of institutions into account when taking regulatory actions, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/13/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date
07/13/2017Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-108.
Action By: Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs
06/22/2017Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-82.
Action By: Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs
06/08/2017Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-81.
Action By: Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs
02/13/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (9)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 03/13/2017
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 03/28/2017
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 03/28/2017
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 03/28/2017
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 03/28/2017
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 03/29/2017
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 04/04/2017
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 05/16/2017
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 10/03/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs02/13/2017 Referred to
07/13/2017 Hearings by

As of 12/13/2018 no related bill information has been received for S.366 - TAILOR Act of 2017.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.366. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/13/2017)

Taking Account of Institutions with Low Operation Risk Act of 2017 or the TAILOR Act of 2017

This bill requires federal financial regulatory agencies to: (1) in general, tailor a regulatory action so as to limit the regulatory impact and other burdens on the institutions involved, with consideration of the risk profiles and business models of those institutions; and (2) report to Congress on specific actions taken to do so, as well as on other related issues.

The bill's requirements apply not only to future regulatory actions but also to regulations adopted on or after July 21, 2010.