There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Forever GI Bill Housing Payment Fulfillment Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to establish a tiger team dedicated to addressing the difficulties encountered by the Department of Veterans Affairs in carrying out section 3313 of title 38, United States Code, after the enactment of sections 107 and 501 of the Harry W. Colmery Veterans Educational Assistance Act of 2017.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
01/03/2019Became Public Law No: 115-422.
01/03/2019Signed by President.
12/27/2018Presented to President.
12/20/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 389 - 0 (Roll no. 466).(text: CR H10428-10429)
12/18/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7821-7822; text: CR S7821-7822)
12/18/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
01/03/2019Became Public Law No: 115-422.
01/03/2019Signed by President.
12/27/2018SenatePresented to President.
12/20/2018-2:59pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/20/2018-2:59pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 389 - 0 (Roll no. 466). (text: CR H10428-10429)
12/20/2018-2:56pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10442-10443)
12/20/2018-1:29pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/20/2018-1:26pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3777.
12/20/2018-1:26pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10428-10430)
12/20/2018-1:25pmHouseMr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/19/2018-5:04pmHouseHeld at the desk.
12/19/2018-2:13pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/19/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/18/2018SenateIntroduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7821-7822; text: CR S7821-7822)

Committees (0)

As of 02/21/2019 text has not been received for S.3777 - Forever GI Bill Housing Payment Fulfillment Act of 2018

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


No related bill information was received for S.3777.


Subjects (0)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.