There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

KOMBUCHA
Keeping Our Manufacturers from Being Unfairly taxed while Championing Health Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to ensure that kombucha is exempt from any excise taxes and regulations imposed on alcoholic beverages.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/15/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
02/15/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO]* 02/15/2017
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 03/01/2017
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 03/23/2017
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 05/07/2018
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/09/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance02/15/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.389. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/15/2017)

Keeping Our Manufacturers from Being Unfairly taxed while Championing Health Act or KOMBUCHA

This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to exempt the production of kombucha for consumption or sale from excise taxes imposed on alcoholic beverages. Kombucha is a beverage that: (1) is fermented solely by a symbiotic culture of bacteria and yeast; (2) contains not more than 1.25% of alcohol by volume; (3) is sold or offered for sale as kombucha; and (4) is derived from sugar, malt or malt substitute, tea, or coffee, and not more than 20% other wholesome ingredients.