There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to make technical amendments to certain marine fish conservation statutes, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
10/02/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S6263; text: CR S6263)
09/19/2017Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune without amendment. With written report No. 115-160.
02/15/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber
10/04/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
10/03/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
10/03/2017-3:05pmHouseReceived in the House.
10/03/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/02/2017SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S6263; text: CR S6263)
09/19/2017SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 224.
09/19/2017SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune without amendment. With written report No. 115-160.
Action By: Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation
05/18/2017SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation
02/15/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 02/15/2017
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 02/15/2017
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 02/15/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation02/15/2017 Referred to
05/18/2017 Markup by
09/19/2017 Reported by S. Rept. 115-160
House Natural Resources10/03/2017 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans10/04/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (2)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.396. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (10/02/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the Senate reported version is repeated here.)

(Sec. 1) This bill amends the Billfish Conservation Act of 2012 to limit the sale of billfish caught by U.S. fishing vessels.

Under current law, billfish caught by U.S. vessels that land (number or poundage of fish unloaded onshore by commercial fisherman) in Hawaii or Pacific Insular Areas (American Samoa, Baker Island, Guam, Howland Island, Jarvis Island, Johnston Atoll, Kingman Reef, Midway Island, the Northern Mariana Islands, Palmyra Atoll, and Wake Island) may be sold and exported to non-U.S. markets or transported to other U.S. markets.

This bill requires billfish caught by U.S. vessels that land in Hawaii or Pacific Insular Areas to be retained for sale in those areas.