There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

ACE Kids Act of 2017
Advancing Care for Exceptional Kids Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend titles XIX and XXI of the Social Security Act to authorize States to provide coordinated care to children with complex medical conditions through enhanced pediatric health homes, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/16/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
02/16/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 02/16/2017
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 02/16/2017
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA]* 02/16/2017
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 02/16/2017
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 02/16/2017
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 02/16/2017
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO]* 02/16/2017
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 02/16/2017
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 03/14/2017
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 04/27/2017
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 05/03/2017
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/10/2017
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 05/16/2017
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 05/16/2017
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 05/22/2017
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/24/2017
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 08/02/2017
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 09/11/2017
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 09/12/2017
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 10/17/2017
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 11/01/2017
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 02/15/2018
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 02/26/2018
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/15/2018
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 04/10/2018
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/24/2018
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 05/07/2018
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 05/08/2018
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 05/08/2018
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 05/14/2018
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 05/17/2018
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/21/2018
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 05/21/2018
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 07/10/2018
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/10/2018
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR] 07/10/2018
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS] 07/18/2018
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 07/18/2018
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 08/21/2018
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 11/28/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance02/16/2017 Referred to

As of 12/13/2018 no related bill information has been received for S.428 - ACE Kids Act of 2017.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.428. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/16/2017)

Advancing Care for Exceptional Kids Act of 2017 or the ACE Kids Act of 2017

This bill allows a state Medicaid program or child health plan to provide coordinated care through enhanced pediatric health homes (EPHHs) for children who have complex medical conditions. Pursuant to an agreement with a state, an EPHH offers: (1) comprehensive pediatric care management, (2) care coordination and health promotion, (3) comprehensive transitional care, (4) patient and family support, (5) referrals to community and social support services, (6) the use of health information technology to link services, and (7) coordination of access to the full range of pediatric specialty and subspecialty medical services.

In general, an EPHH must enroll any eligible child who requests enrollment. A child who opts to enroll shall have the option to disenroll from the EPHH and instead receive covered services under the state Medicaid program or the Children's Health Insurance Program (CHIP).

Each state shall develop a methodology for payment to EPHHs under the state plan.

The bill establishes requirements related to data collection and quality assurance.

The Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services (CMS) shall issue guidance to states on best practices for ensuring that children with complex medical conditions receive prompt care from out-of-state providers when medically necessary.

The Medicaid and CHIP Payment and Access Commission must report to Congress and the CMS on specified information related to children with complex medical conditions.