There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Supporting America's Innovators Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Supporting America's Innovators Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Supporting America's Innovators Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Investment Company Act of 1940 to expand the investor limitation for qualifying venture capital funds under an exemption from the definition of an investment company.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/11/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5168; text: CR S5168)
03/13/2017Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Reported by Senator Crapo without amendment. Without written report.
02/27/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber
09/12/2017-7:59pmHouseHeld at the desk.
09/12/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/12/2017-5:06pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/11/2017SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5168; text: CR S5168)
04/26/2017SenateCommittee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-58.
03/13/2017SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 12.
03/13/2017SenateCommittee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Reported by Senator Crapo without amendment. Without written report.
03/09/2017SenateCommittee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
02/27/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 02/27/2017
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 03/06/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs02/27/2017 Referred to
03/09/2017 Markup by
03/13/2017 Reported by
Senate Small Business and Entrepreneurship04/26/2017 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.444. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (09/11/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the Senate reported version is repeated here.)

Supporting America's Innovators Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Investment Company Act of 1940 to exempt from the definition of an "investment company," for purposes of specified limitations applicable to such a company under the Act, a qualifying venture capital fund that has no more than 250 investors. Specifically, the bill applies to a venture capital fund that has less than $10 million in aggregate capital contributions and uncalled committed capital.

Under current law, a venture capital fund is considered to be an investment company if it has more than 100 investors.