There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Constitutional Concealed Carry Reciprocity Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to allow reciprocity for the carrying of certain concealed firearms.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/27/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date
03/14/2018Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/27/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 02/27/2017
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 02/27/2017
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 02/27/2017
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV]* 02/27/2017
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 02/27/2017
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 02/27/2017
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX]* 02/27/2017
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT]* 02/27/2017
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 02/27/2017
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA]* 02/27/2017
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 02/27/2017
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 02/27/2017
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 02/27/2017
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 02/27/2017
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 02/27/2017
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 02/27/2017
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 02/27/2017
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 02/27/2017
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 02/27/2017
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 02/27/2017
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA]* 02/27/2017
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 02/27/2017
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 02/27/2017
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD]* 02/27/2017
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 02/27/2017
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 02/27/2017
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 02/27/2017
Sen. Young, Todd C. [R-IN]* 02/27/2017
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI]* 02/27/2017
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ]* 02/27/2017
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK] 02/28/2017
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 03/02/2017
Sen. Strange, Luther [R-AL] 03/02/2017
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 03/02/2017
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 03/02/2017
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 03/06/2017
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 05/22/2017
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 09/18/2017
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 11/30/2017
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS] 04/26/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary02/27/2017 Referred to
03/14/2018 Hearings by

As of 12/13/2018 no related bill information has been received for S.446 - Constitutional Concealed Carry Reciprocity Act of 2017.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.446. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/27/2017)

Constitutional Concealed Carry Reciprocity Act of 2017

This bill amends the federal criminal code to allow a qualified individual to carry a concealed handgun into or possess a concealed handgun in another state that allows its residents to carry concealed firearms.

A qualified individual must: (1) be eligible to possess, transport, or receive a firearm under federal law; (2) carry a valid photo identification document; and (3) carry a valid state-issued concealed carry permit, or be eligible to carry a concealed firearm in his or her state of residence.