There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Justice for Uncompensated Survivors Today (JUST) Act of 2017

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Justice for Uncompensated Survivors Today (JUST) Act of 2017

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Justice for Uncompensated Survivors Today (JUST) Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Justice for Uncompensated Survivors Today (JUST) Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Justice for Uncompensated Survivors Today (JUST) Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require reporting on acts of certain foreign countries on Holocaust era assets and related issues.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
05/09/2018Became Public Law No: 115-171. (TXT | PDF)
05/09/2018Signed by President.
04/27/2018Presented to President.
04/24/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H3460)
12/12/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7950; text as passed Senate: CR S7950)
12/05/2017Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
02/27/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
05/09/2018Became Public Law No: 115-171. (TXT | PDF)
05/09/2018Signed by President.
04/27/2018SenatePresented to President.
04/24/2018-4:19pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/24/2018-4:19pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3460)
04/24/2018-3:37pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 447.
04/24/2018-3:37pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3460-3464)
04/24/2018-3:37pmHouseMr. Poe (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/12/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
12/12/2017-12:24pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/12/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/12/2017SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7950; text as passed Senate: CR S7950)
12/05/2017SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 274.
12/05/2017SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
12/05/2017SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
02/27/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations02/27/2017 Referred to
12/05/2017 Markup by
12/05/2017 Reported by
House Foreign Affairs12/12/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.447. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-171 (05/09/2018)

Justice for Uncompensated Survivors Today (JUST) Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill requires the Department of State to report to Congress assessing the national laws and enforceable policies of covered countries regarding the identification and return of, or restitution for, assets wrongfully seized or transferred during the Holocaust era, including:

  • the return to the rightful owner of wrongfully seized or transferred property, including religious or communal property, or the provision of comparable substitute property or the payment of equitable compensation;
  • the restitution of heirless property to assist needy Holocaust survivors; and
  • progress on the resolution of claims for U.S.-citizen Holocaust survivors and family members.

"Covered countries" are participants in the 2009 Holocaust Era Assets Conference that are determined by the State Department, in consultation with expert nongovernmental organizations, to be countries of particular concern relative to the restitution of Holocaust-era assets.