There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to clarify the description of certain Federal land under the Northern Arizona Land Exchange and Verde River Basin Partnership Act of 2005 to include additional land in the Kaibab National Forest.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
03/22/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-615.
12/21/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S8267-8269; text: CR S8269)
05/03/2017Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-41.
02/28/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
03/22/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 469.
03/22/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-615.
03/14/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/14/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/14/2018HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
01/02/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
12/22/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
12/22/2017-2:05pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/22/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/21/2017SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S8267-8269; text: CR S8269)
05/03/2017SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 55.
05/03/2017SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-41.
03/30/2017SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
02/28/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 02/28/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Energy and Natural Resources02/28/2017 Referred to
03/30/2017 Markup by
05/03/2017 Reported by S. Rept. 115-41
House Natural Resources12/22/2017 Referred to
03/14/2018 Markup by
03/22/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-615
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands01/02/2018 Referred to
03/14/2018 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for S.466.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.466. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (03/22/2018)

(Sec. 1) This bill amends the Northern Arizona Land Exchange and Verde River Basin Partnership Act of 2005 to convey to the Yavapai Ranch 25 acres of land within the Kaibab National Forest at the Gila and Salt River Meridian, Coconino County, Arizona.