There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

JOBS and Investor Confidence Act of 2018

Short Titles as Passed House for portions of this bill
  • International Insurance Standards Act of 2018

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Encouraging Employee Ownership Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Encouraging Employee Ownership Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Encouraging Employee Ownership Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To modernize U.S. markets and to promote capital formation, investor confidence, and economic growth, and for other purposes

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to increase the threshold for disclosures required by the Securities and Exchange Commission relating to compensatory benefit plans, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
07/17/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 406 - 4 (Roll no. 333).(text: CR H6295-6306)
09/11/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5169; text: CR S5169)
03/13/2017Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Reported by Senator Crapo without amendment. Without written report.
03/01/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
07/18/2018SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
07/17/2018-6:42pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
07/17/2018-6:42pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/17/2018-6:42pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 406 - 4 (Roll no. 333). (text: CR H6295-6306)
07/17/2018-6:19pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6342-6343)
07/17/2018-4:14pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
07/17/2018-3:20pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 488.
07/17/2018-3:20pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6295-6312)
07/17/2018-3:20pmHouseMr. Hensarling moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/12/2017-8:00pmHouseHeld at the desk.
09/12/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/12/2017-5:06pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/11/2017SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5169; text: CR S5169)
03/13/2017SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 15.
03/13/2017SenateCommittee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Reported by Senator Crapo without amendment. Without written report.
03/09/2017SenateCommittee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
03/01/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 03/01/2017
Sen. Sasse, Ben [R-NE] 03/09/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs03/01/2017 Referred to
03/09/2017 Markup by
03/13/2017 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.488. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (09/11/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the Senate reported version is repeated here.)

Encouraging Employee Ownership Act

(Sec. 2) This bill  requires the Securities and Exchange Commission to increase, from $5 million to $10 million, the 12-month sales threshold beyond which an issuer is required to provide investors with additional disclosures related to compensatory benefit plans.