There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

BEST Practices Act
Battlefield Excellence through Superior Training Practices Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 10, United States Code, to require the Secretary of Defense to use only human-based methods for training members of the Armed Forces in the treatment of severe combat injuries, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/02/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
03/02/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI]* 03/02/2017
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 12/05/2017
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 12/05/2017
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 03/12/2018
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 07/17/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Armed Services03/02/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.498. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/02/2017)

Battlefield Excellence through Superior Training Practices Act or the BEST Practices Act

This bill requires the Department of Defense (DOD), no later than: (1) October 1, 2020, to develop, test, and validate human-based training methods for training members of the Armed Forces in the treatment of combat trauma injuries, with the goal of replacing live animal-based training methods; and (2) October 1, 2022, to use only use human-based training methods for such purposes.

The bill prohibits the use of animals in such training after the latter date, but permits DOD to exempt a particular command or training method from human-based training method requirements for up to one year if the human-based methods will not provide an educationally equivalent or superior substitute for live animal-based training methods. Allows exemption periods to be renewed.

DOD shall submit an annual report to Congress regarding the development and implementation of the human-based training methods, including the justifications for any exemptions.