There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Nuclear Energy Innovation and Modernization Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Nuclear Energy Innovation and Modernization Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Nuclear Energy Innovation and Modernization Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Nuclear Energy Innovation and Modernization Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Nuclear Energy Innovation and Modernization Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to modernize the regulation of nuclear energy.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
01/14/2019Became Public Law No: 115-439. (TXT | PDF)
01/14/2019Signed by President.
01/02/2019Presented to President.
12/21/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 361 - 10 (Roll no. 493).(text: CR H10553-10557)
12/20/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S7957-7962; text: CR S7962)
05/25/2017Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-86. Additional views filed.
03/02/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (24)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/14/2019Became Public Law No: 115-439. (TXT | PDF)
01/14/2019Signed by President.
01/02/2019SenatePresented to President.
12/21/2018-4:47pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/21/2018-4:47pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 361 - 10 (Roll no. 493). (text: CR H10553-10557)
12/21/2018-4:44pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10577-10578)
12/21/2018-11:19amHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/21/2018-11:11amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 512.
12/21/2018-11:11amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10553-10558)
12/21/2018-11:10amHouseMr. Kinzinger moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/20/2018-8:30pmHouseHeld at the desk.
12/20/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/20/2018-12:42pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/20/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S7957-7962; text: CR S7962)
12/20/2018SenateS.Amdt.4175 Amendment SA 4175 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
12/20/2018SenateS.Amdt.4175 Amendment SA 4175 proposed by Senator Sullivan for Senator Barrasso. (consideration: CR S7962) In the nature of a substitute.
12/20/2018SenateThe committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent.
12/20/2018SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
05/25/2017SenateAn errata sheet on written report number No. 115-86 was printed.
05/25/2017SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 108.
05/25/2017SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-86. Additional views filed.
03/22/2017SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
03/08/2017SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-52.
03/02/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Cosponsors (18)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Environment and Public Works03/02/2017 Referred to
03/08/2017 Hearings by
03/22/2017 Markup by
05/25/2017 Reported by S. Rept. 115-86

No related bill information was received for S.512.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.512. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-439 (01/14/2019)

Nuclear Energy Innovation and Modernization Act

This bill revises the budget and fee structure of the Nuclear Regulatory Commission (NRC) and requires the NRC to develop new processes for licensing nuclear reactors, including staged licensing of advanced nuclear reactors.

TITLE I--ADVANCED NUCLEAR REACTORS AND USER FEES

(Sec. 101) The bill amends the Omnibus Budget Reconciliation Act of 1990 to remove amounts appropriated for the development of regulations for advanced nuclear reactor technologies from the amount the NRC must recover through fees.

(Sec. 102) Effective FY2021, the bill:

  • excludes additional amounts from the amount the NRC must recover through fees, including amounts for research and development at universities;
  • directs the NRC to collect fees equal to its budget authority, less excluded amounts;
  • limits NRC's spending on corporate support costs; and
  • places a cap on the amount of the annual fee that may be charged to an operating reactor, which the NRC may waive if the cap compromises the NRC's safety and security mission.

Performance metrics and milestone schedules must be developed for activities requested by applicants and licensees. In addition, the NRC must implement processes to ensure accurate invoicing.

(Sec. 103) For commercial advanced nuclear reactors, the NRC must (1) establish stages within the licensing process; (2) increase the use of risk-informed, performance-based licensing evaluation techniques and guidance; and (3) establish by the end of 2027 a technology-inclusive regulatory framework that encourages greater technological innovation.

The NRC must develop research and test reactor licensing.

The NRC is also directed to train staff and develop the expertise required to implement the new licensing processes.

The NRC must report to Congress on (1) the implementation of stages in the advanced reactor licensing process, and (2) the use of risk-informed and performance-based techniques within the existing regulatory framework.

(Sec. 104) The NRC must publish any necessary revisions to the guidance on the examination schedule for baffle-former bolts in certain reactors.

(Sec. 105) The NRC must submit to Congress a report describing the actions it has taken, or plans to take, to consider lessons learned from recent disasters regarding directed or spontaneous evacuations in densely populated urban and suburban areas.

(Sec. 106) The bill increases the percentage of operating costs that research reactors are allowed to recover from 50% to 75%, with up to 50% coming from energy sales.

(Sec. 107) The NRC must submit to Congress a report describing the status of the licensing process for accident tolerant fuel. (Accident tolerant fuel is a new technology that makes an existing commercial nuclear reactor more resistant to a nuclear incident and lowers the cost of electricity over the licensed lifetime of a reactor.)

(Sec. 108) The NRC must submit to Congress a report on the best practices for establishing and operating local community advisory boards.

(Sec. 109) The NRC must submit to Congress a report on actions it is taking to address the appearance of workplace reprisals.

TITLE II--URANIUM

(Sec. 201) The NRC must (1) report to Congress on the duration of uranium recovery licenses and recommendations to improve the efficiency and transparency of uranium recovery licensing, and (2) complete a voluntary pilot program to determine the feasibility of establishing a flat fee structure for routine licensing matters relating to uranium recovery.