There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted for portions of this bill
  • Protecting Young Victims from Sexual Abuse and Safe Sport Authorization Act of 2017

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Protecting Young Victims from Sexual Abuse and Safe Sport Authorization Act of 2017

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Protecting Young Victims from Sexual Abuse and Safe Sport Authorization Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Protecting Young Victims from Sexual Abuse Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Protecting Young Victims from Sexual Abuse Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to prevent the sexual abuse of minors and amateur athletes by requiring the prompt reporting of sexual abuse to law enforcement authorities, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
02/14/2018Became Public Law No: 115-126. (TXT | PDF)
02/14/2018Signed by President.
02/07/2018Presented to President.
01/30/2018Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to the House amendment to S. 534 by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S589-591)
01/29/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 406 - 3 (Roll no. 45).(text: CR H633-634)
11/14/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
06/08/2017Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
03/06/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (26)

Date Chamber
02/14/2018Became Public Law No: 115-126. (TXT | PDF)
02/14/2018Signed by President.
02/07/2018SenatePresented to President.
01/30/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
01/30/2018SenateSenate agreed to the House amendment to S. 534 by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S589-591)
01/30/2018SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
01/29/2018-6:58pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/29/2018-6:58pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 406 - 3 (Roll no. 45). (text: CR H633-634)
01/29/2018-6:33pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H652-653)
01/29/2018-5:44pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
01/29/2018-5:01pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 534.
01/29/2018-5:00pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H633-643)
01/29/2018-5:00pmHouseMr. Poe (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
11/15/2017-3:51pmHouseHeld at the desk.
11/15/2017-12:40pmHouseReceived in the House.
11/15/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/14/2017SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
11/14/2017SenateS.Amdt.1584 Amendment SA 1584 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
11/14/2017SenateS.Amdt.1584 Amendment SA 1584 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Feinstein. (consideration: CR S7220-7221) In the nature of a substitute.
11/14/2017SenateThe committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7220)
11/14/2017SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7219-7221; text of measure as reported: CR S7219-7220)
06/08/2017SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 121.
06/08/2017SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
05/11/2017SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
03/28/2017SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
03/06/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary03/06/2017 Referred to
03/28/2017 Hearings by
05/11/2017 Markup by
06/08/2017 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.534. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-126 (02/14/2018)

Protecting Young Victims from Sexual Abuse and Safe Sport Authorization Act of 2017

TITLE I--PROTECTING YOUNG VICTIMS FROM SEXUAL ABUSE

(Sec. 101) This bill amends the Victims of Child Abuse Act of 1990 to extend the duty to report suspected child abuse, including sexual abuse, to adults who are authorized to interact with minor or amateur athletes at an amateur sports organization facility or at an event sanctioned by a national governing body (NGB) or member of an NGB. An NGB is an amateur sports organization that is recognized by the U.S. Olympic Committee.

An authorized adult who fails to report suspected child abuse within a 24-hour period is subject to criminal penalties.

(Sec. 102) The bill amends the federal criminal code to revise civil remedy provisions for a victim of a human trafficking offense or federal sex offense. Among other things, it changes the civil statute of limitations to 10 years from the date the victim reasonably discovers the violation or injury (currently, 10 years from the date the cause of action arose). The bill also extends the statute of limitations for a minor victim of a human trafficking or federal sex offense to file a civil action to 10 years (currently, 3 years) from the date such individual reaches age 18.

TITLE II--UNITED STATES CENTER FOR SAFE SPORT AUTHORIZATION

(Sec. 201) The bill expands the purposes of the U.S. Olympic Committee to include promoting a safe environment in sports that is free from abuse of amateur athletes.

(Sec. 202) The bill designates the United States Center for Safe Sport to serve as the independent national safe sport organization.

The center has jurisdiction over the U.S. Olympic Committee, NGBs, and Paralympic sports organizations with respect to safeguarding amateur athletes from abuse. It must develop training, practices, policies, and procedures to prevent abuse.

NGBs must implement the policies and procedures to prevent abuse.

(Sec. 203) An amateur sports organization that requests an NGB sanction to host an international amateur athletic competition inside the United States or to sponsor U.S. athletes in an international amateur athletic competition outside the United States must implement and comply with the policies and procedures to prevent abuse.

(Sec. 204) An amateur sports organization that is not subject to the center's policies and procedures to prevent abuse must comply with certain general requirements, including to report suspected child abuse and to limit one-on-one contact between an amateur athlete who is a minor and an adult.