There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Performance Accountability and Contractor Transparency Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to require the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to include in each contract into which the Secretary enters for necessary services authorities and mechanism for appropriate oversight, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/07/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date
05/17/2017Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
03/07/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 03/07/2017
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 03/07/2017
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 03/08/2017
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/09/2017
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 03/09/2017
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 06/08/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Veterans' Affairs03/07/2017 Referred to
05/17/2017 Hearings by

As of 05/22/2018 no related bill information has been received for S.543 - Performance Accountability and Contractor Transparency Act of 2017.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.543. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/07/2017)

Performance Accountability and Contractor Transparency Act of 2017

This bill requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to ensure that each VA contract for services includes:

  • measurable metrics on the cost, schedule, and fulfillment of contract requirements;
  • a plan of action and milestones for the provision of the service, including a description of the resources the provider will assign to provide the service;
  • safeguards, including authority to levy financial penalties, to ensure that the service provided meets a minimum threshold of quality; and
  • measurable metrics on the use of award or incentive fees.

In each case of a contract that would result in the VA incurring an obligation exceeding $100 million, the VA must:

  • ensure that the contract requires the service provider to document its work through VA information technology systems so that the VA can review and validate the quality of the service provided using the metrics set forth in the contract;
  • use the appropriate VA project management accountability system to ensure that the contract provides an adequate return on investment;
  • report on any failure of the service provider to meet contractual obligations, the effect of such failure, and the actions taken by the VA and by the contractor to address it;
  • report the details of any modifications made to the contract and a justification for such modifications; and
  • publish information about the contract and any modifications on its website.