There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Veterans Access, Choice, and Accountability Act of 2014 to modify the termination date for the Veterans Choice Program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
04/19/2017Became Public Law No: 115-26. (TXT | PDF)
04/19/2017Signed by President.
04/07/2017Presented to President.
04/05/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H2722)
04/03/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.(text: CR S2163)
04/03/2017Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2163-2164)
03/07/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
04/19/2017Became Public Law No: 115-26. (TXT | PDF)
04/19/2017Signed by President.
04/07/2017SenatePresented to President.
04/05/2017-2:42pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/05/2017-2:42pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2722)
04/05/2017-2:10pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 544.
04/05/2017-2:09pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2722-2726)
04/05/2017-2:08pmHouseMr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
04/03/2017-7:20pmHouseHeld at the desk.
04/03/2017-6:09pmHouseReceived in the House.
04/03/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
04/03/2017SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (text: CR S2163)
04/03/2017SenateSenate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2163-2164)
03/07/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Veterans' Affairs03/07/2017 Referred to
04/03/2017 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.544. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-26 (04/19/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the Senate passed version is repeated here.)

(Sec. 1) This bill amends the Veterans Access, Choice, and Accountability Act of 2014 to eliminate the August 7, 2017, sunset date for the Veterans Choice Program, thus allowing the program to operate until all of the money in the Veterans Choice Fund is expended.

(Sec. 2) The bill makes the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) the primary payer (currently the VA is the secondary payer) for medical care relating to non-service connected disabilities and recovery of costs from third parties for certain care under the program.

(Sec. 3) The VA may share medical information with a non-VA entity (including private entities and other federal agencies) that provides veterans with authorized hospital care or medical services. Such entity may not redisclose or use such information for a purpose other than that for which the disclosure was made.