There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Land and Water Conservation Authorization and Funding Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Land and Water Conservation Authorization and Funding Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 54, United States Code, to provide consistent and reliable authority for, and for the funding of, the Land and Water Conservation Fund to maximize the effectiveness of the Fund for future generations, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
12/11/2018By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-428.
12/04/2018Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
03/08/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date
12/11/2018By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-428.
Action By: Senate
12/04/2018Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 709.
Action By: Senate
12/04/2018Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
10/02/2018Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
03/08/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (50)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 03/08/2017
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 03/08/2017
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 03/08/2017
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 03/08/2017
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 03/08/2017
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 03/08/2017
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM]* 03/08/2017
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 03/08/2017
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 03/08/2017
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 03/08/2017
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 03/08/2017
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 03/08/2017
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI]* 03/08/2017
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 03/08/2017
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 03/08/2017
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 03/08/2017
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 03/08/2017
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 03/08/2017
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 03/08/2017
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 03/08/2017
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 03/08/2017
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 03/09/2017
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 04/04/2017
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 04/05/2017
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 04/25/2017
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 04/25/2017
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 05/04/2017
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 05/08/2017
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA] 05/09/2017
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 05/10/2017
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 05/18/2017
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 05/22/2017
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 06/05/2017
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 06/15/2017
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/20/2017
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 10/18/2017
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 02/05/2018
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 02/05/2018
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 02/13/2018
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 03/08/2018
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 03/08/2018
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/13/2018
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/09/2018
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 07/12/2018
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 07/25/2018
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 08/01/2018
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 08/23/2018
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 10/03/2018
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 10/09/2018
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 11/14/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources03/08/2017 Referred to
10/02/2018 Markup by
12/04/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-428

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.569. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/08/2017)

Land and Water Conservation Authorization and Funding Act

This bill amends the Land and Water Conservation Fund Act of 1965 to make permanent the authorization for the Land and Water Conservation Fund (LWCF).

Funds deposited into the LWCF may be spent without being subject to the appropriations process. These funds are in addition to amounts made available by the Gulf of Mexico Energy Security Act of 2006 or otherwise appropriated from the LWCF.

The President shall submit to Congress specified details regarding the allocation of funds provided by this bill. Congress may provide for alternate allocations using specified procedures.

At least 1.5% of the annual authorized funds shall be used for projects that secure recreational public access to existing federal public land for hunting, fishing, and other recreational purposes.