There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Military and Veteran Caregiver Services Improvement Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to expand eligibility for the program of comprehensive assistance for family caregivers of the Department of Veterans Affairs, to expand benefits available to participants under such program, to enhance special compensation for members of the uniformed services who require assistance in everyday life, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/09/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
06/14/2017Special Committee on Aging. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-364.
05/17/2017Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-299.
03/09/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (35)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Veterans' Affairs03/09/2017 Referred to
05/17/2017 Hearings by
Senate Aging (Special)06/14/2017 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.591. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/09/2017)

Military and Veteran Caregiver Services Improvement Act of 2017

This bill expands eligibility for the family caregiver program of the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to include members of the Armed Forces or veterans who are seriously injured or who became ill on active duty prior to September 11, 2001 (currently, limited to service after September 11, 2001).

Services to caregivers of veterans under such program are expanded to include child care services, financial planning services, and legal services.

The bill terminates the support program for caregivers of covered veterans on October 1, 2022, except that any caregiver activities carried out on September 30, 2022, shall be continued on and after October 1, 2022.

The bill authorizes the transfer of entitlement to post 9/11 education assistance to family members by veterans who are retired for a physical disability or who are seriously injured veterans in need of family caregiver services, without regard to length-of-service requirements.

The VA is authorized to pay monthly special compensation to seriously injured or ill veterans in need of personal care services and to their caregivers.

Flexible work schedules or telework are authorized for federal employees who are caregivers of veterans.

The Public Health Service Act is amended to designate a veteran participating in the program of comprehensive assistance for family caregivers as an adult with a special need for purposes of the lifespan respite care program.

An interagency working group is established in the executive branch to review and report on policies relating to the caregivers of veterans and members of the Armed Forces.

The VA shall provide for studies on members of the Armed Forces who commenced service after September 11, 2001, and veterans who have incurred a serious injury or illness, including a mental health injury, and their caregivers.