There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Children of Fallen Heroes Scholarship Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Children of Fallen Heroes Scholarship Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to increase Federal Pell Grants for the children of fallen public safety officers, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
09/07/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.(text: CR S5077-5078)
09/07/2017Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5077-5078)
03/09/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/21/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
09/07/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/07/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/07/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/07/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/07/2017-6:44pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/07/2017SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (text: CR S5077-5078)
09/07/2017SenateSenate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5077-5078)
03/09/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 03/09/2017
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN]* 03/09/2017
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 03/09/2017
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 05/18/2017
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/22/2017

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions03/09/2017 Referred to
09/07/2017 Discharged from
House Education and the Workforce09/07/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary09/07/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations09/21/2017 Referred to
House Budget09/07/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.597. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/09/2017)

Children of Fallen Heroes Scholarship Act

This bill amends title IV (Student Assistance) of the Higher Education Act of 1965 to eliminate the expected family contribution (EFC) used to determine financial need in the case of a Pell Grant-eligible student whose parent or guardian died in the line of duty as a police officer, firefighter, or other public safety officer. Such student is eligible to receive an automatic zero EFC and qualify for the maximum Pell Grant award if the student was less than 24 years old or enrolled at an institution of higher education at the time of the parent or guardian's death.