There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

PACT Act
Preventing Animal Cruelty and Torture Act

Short Titles as Introduced

PACT Act
Preventing Animal Cruelty and Torture Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to revise section 48 of title 18, United States Code, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
12/14/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S8049)
12/14/2017Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8049)
03/15/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date Chamber
12/15/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
12/15/2017-5:33pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/14/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/14/2017SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S8049)
12/14/2017SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8049)
03/15/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 03/15/2017
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 03/15/2017
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 03/15/2017
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/09/2017
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 05/10/2017
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 05/11/2017
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 05/22/2017
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 05/22/2017
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 05/25/2017
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 05/25/2017
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 06/06/2017
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 06/12/2017
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 06/26/2017
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/27/2017
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 06/27/2017
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/10/2017
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 07/10/2017
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/25/2017
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 08/03/2017
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 09/25/2017
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 10/05/2017
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 10/05/2017
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 10/17/2017
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 10/19/2017
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 10/23/2017
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 10/24/2017
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 10/30/2017
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 11/02/2017
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 11/06/2017
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA] 11/16/2017
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 11/30/2017
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 12/01/2017
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 12/01/2017
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 12/12/2017
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 12/18/2017
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 12/19/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary03/15/2017 Referred to
12/14/2017 Discharged from
House Judiciary12/15/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.654. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (12/14/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Preventing Animal Cruelty and Torture Act or the PACT Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the federal criminal code to revise and expand provisions with respect to animal crushing.

It retains existing criminal offenses that prohibit knowingly creating or distributing an animal crush video using interstate commerce. The bill also adds a new provision to criminalize an intentional act of animal crushing. A violator is subject to criminal penalties—a fine, a prison term of up to seven years, or both.

It provides additional exceptions for conduct, or a video of conduct, including conduct that is: (1) medical or scientific research, (2) necessary to protect the life or property of a person, (3) performed as part of euthanizing an animal, or (4) unintentional.