There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Water Infrastructure Flexibility Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Water Infrastructure Flexibility Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Water Infrastructure Flexibility Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for integrated plan permits, to establish an Office of the Municipal Ombudsman, to promote green infrastructure, and to require the revision of financial capability guidance.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
10/05/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6373-6374; text: CR S6373-6374)
05/25/2017Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-87.
03/21/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
10/13/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
10/10/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
10/10/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
10/10/2017-2:08pmHouseReceived in the House.
10/10/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/05/2017SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6373-6374; text: CR S6373-6374)
05/25/2017SenateAn errata sheet on written report No. 115-87 was printed. (text: 115S.Rept.87 errata)
05/25/2017SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 109.
05/25/2017SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-87.
Action By: Committee on Environment and Public Works
04/05/2017SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Action By: Committee on Environment and Public Works
03/28/2017SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works Subcommittee on Fisheries, Water, and Wildlife. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 115-12.
Action By: Senate Environment and Public Works Subcommittee on Fisheries, Water, and Wildlife
03/21/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Cosponsors (9)


Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Environment and Public Works03/21/2017 Referred to
04/05/2017 Markup by
05/25/2017 Reported by S. Rept. 115-87
Senate Environment and Public Works Subcommittee on Fisheries, Water, and Wildlife03/28/2017 Hearings by
House Transportation and Infrastructure10/10/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce10/10/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Environment10/13/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.692. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (10/05/2017)

Water Infrastructure Flexibility Act

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the Senate on May 25, 2017. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

(Sec. 3) This bill amends the Federal Water Pollution Control Act (commonly known as the Clean Water Act) to allow municipalities to develop a plan that integrates wastewater and stormwater management.

A permit for a municipal discharge under the national pollutant discharge elimination system that incorporates an integrated plan may integrate all requirements under the Act addressed in the plan, including requirements relating to: (1) a combined sewer overflow; (2) a capacity, management, operation, and maintenance program for sanitary sewer collection systems; (3) a municipal stormwater discharge; (4) a municipal wastewater discharge; and (5) a total maximum daily load program.

Those permits may include a schedule of compliance that allows actions for meeting water quality-based effluent limitations to be implemented over more than one permit term if the compliance schedules are authorized by state water quality standards. Those actions may include implementing green infrastructure as part of a water quality-based effluent limitation. (Green infrastructure includes measures that mimic natural processes to store, reuse, or reduce stormwater.)

The bill establishes an Office of the Municipal Ombudsman in the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) to provide: (1) technical assistance to municipalities seeking to comply with the Clean Water Act and the Safe Drinking Water Act, and (2) information to the EPA to ensure that agency policies are implemented by all EPA offices.

(Sec. 4) The EPA must ensure that specified EPA offices promote the integration of green infrastructure into permitting programs, planning efforts, research, technical assistance, and funding guidance.

(Sec. 5) The bill establishes requirements for revising the EPA's 1997 guidance about combined sewer overflows, including by setting forth criteria for determining the ability of households to pay utility bills. (Combined sewer systems collect rainwater, sewage, and industrial wastewater into one pipe. During storms, the combined wastewater sometimes exceeds the capacity of the treatment plant. When this occurs, combined sewer overflows discharge directly into water bodies.)