There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

NASA Enhanced Use Leasing Extension Act of 2018

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

NASA Enhanced Use Leasing Extension Act of 2018

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

NASA Enhanced Use Leasing Extension Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

NASA Enhanced Use Leasing Extension Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 51, United States Code, to extend the authority of the National Aeronautics and Space Administration to enter into leases of non-excess property of the Administration.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
12/31/2018Became Public Law No: 115-403. (TXT | PDF)
12/31/2018Signed by President.
12/27/2018Presented to President.
12/20/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 390 - 0 (Roll no. 460).(text: CR H10419)
12/06/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S7372)
12/06/2018Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7371-7372)
11/27/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
12/31/2018Became Public Law No: 115-403. (TXT | PDF)
12/31/2018Signed by President.
12/27/2018SenatePresented to President.
12/20/2018-2:38pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/20/2018-2:38pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 390 - 0 (Roll no. 460). (text: CR H10419)
12/20/2018-2:36pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10438-10439)
12/20/2018-12:50pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/20/2018-12:47pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 7.
12/20/2018-12:47pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10419-10420)
12/20/2018-12:47pmHouseMr. Smith (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/10/2018-4:14pmHouseHeld at the desk.
12/10/2018-2:09pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/10/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/06/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7372)
12/06/2018SenateSenate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7371-7372)
11/27/2018SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation11/27/2018 Referred to
12/06/2018 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.7. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-403 (12/31/2018)

NASA Enhanced Use Leasing Extension Act of 2018

This bill extends through 2019 the authority for the National Aeronautics and Space Administration (NASA) to lease its non-excess real property and related personal property.