There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Protecting Veterans Credit Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Fair Credit Reporting Act to delay the inclusion in consumer credit reports and to establish requirements for debt collectors with respect to medical debt information of veterans due to inappropriate or delayed billing payments or reimbursements from the Department of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/28/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date
10/17/2017Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-132.
Action By: Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs
03/28/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD]* 03/28/2017
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 04/25/2017
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 04/25/2017
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 09/18/2017
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 11/06/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs03/28/2017 Referred to
10/17/2017 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.744. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/28/2017)

Protecting Veterans Credit Act of 2017

This bill amends the Fair Credit Reporting Act to exclude from consumer report information: (1) a veteran's medical debt if the hospital care or medical services relating to the debt antedates the credit report by less than one year; and (2) a fully paid or settled veteran's medical debt that had been characterized as delinquent, charged off, or in collection.

The bill defines a "veteran's medical debt" as debt from health care provided in a non-Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) facility under the laws administered by the VA, including medical debt that the VA has wrongfully charged a veteran.

A dispute process for veterans medical debt is established whereby:

  • a veteran may submit a notice along with proof of VA liability for the debt or documentation that the VA is in the process of paying for authorized medical services to a consumer reporting agency or a reseller in order to dispute such debt's inclusion in the consumer report;
  • the VA shall submit to a veteran a notice it has assumed liability for part or all of the veteran's medical debt; and
  • if such notice and proof of liability or documentation is received, the consumer reporting agency shall delete all information relating to the veteran's medical debt from the file of the consumer and notify the furnisher and the consumer of such deletion.