There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Cyber Scholarship Opportunities Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to support meeting our Nation's growing cybersecurity workforce needs by expanding the cybersecurity education pipeline.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/28/2017 Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date
08/02/2017 Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Action By: Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation
03/28/2017 Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2049)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 03/28/2017
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 03/28/2017
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 04/25/2017
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/31/2017
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 08/03/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation03/28/2017 Referred to
08/02/2017 Markup by

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (10)

  • Computer security and identity theft
  • Education programs funding
  • Elementary and secondary education
  • Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
  • Government information and archives
  • Higher education
  • Science and engineering education
  • Student aid and college costs
  • Teaching, teachers, curricula

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.754. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/28/2017)

Cyber Scholarship Opportunities Act of 2017

This bill amends the Cybersecurity Enhancement Act of 2014 to require at least 5% of scholarships that the National Science Foundation (NSF) coordinates with the Department of Homeland Security under the federal cyber scholarship-for-service program to be provided to students who are pursuing an associate's degree in a cybersecurity field without the intent of transferring to a bachelor's degree program and who either have a bachelor's degree already or are veterans of the Armed Forces.

The post-award employment obligations of scholarship recipients pursuing a doctoral or master's degree may include work at an institution of higher education or for a local educational agency teaching cybersecurity skills.

Scholarship eligibility factors are revised to include: (1) an individual's skills and abilities under the National Institute of Standards and Technology's national cybersecurity awareness and education program, and (2) students pursuing a degree on a less than full-time but not less than half-time basis.

The NSF must work with the Office of Personnel Management to: (1) consolidate information about cyber scholarships programs and job opportunities into a single online resource center; and (2) work with state, local, and tribal agencies to advertise cybersecurity positions to recipients.

The NSF may carry out a program to improve cybersecurity education at the K-12 level.

The NSF may: (1) grant exceptions from the post-award employment obligations to students who agree to work in a critical infrastructure mission at a federal government corporation or a state, local, or tribal government-affiliated component of a critical infrastructure sector; or (2) develop a pilot program to enhance critical infrastructure protection training for students pursuing careers in cybersecurity.