There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

OPEN Government Data Act
Open, Public, Electronic, and Necessary Government Data Act

Short Titles as Introduced

OPEN Government Data Act
Open, Public, Electronic, and Necessary Government Data Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to expand the Government's use and administration of data to facilitate transparency, effective governance, and innovation, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
07/24/2017Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with amendments. With written report No. 115-134.
03/29/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
07/24/2017Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 180.
Action By: Senate
07/24/2017Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with amendments. With written report No. 115-134.
05/17/2017Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
03/29/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Sasse, Ben [R-NE]* 03/29/2017
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 05/01/2017
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 05/15/2017
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 06/08/2017
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 05/22/2018
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 12/19/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs03/29/2017 Referred to
05/17/2017 Markup by
07/24/2017 Reported by S. Rept. 115-134

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.760. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (07/24/2017)

Open, Public, Electronic, and Necessary Government Data Act or the OPEN Government Data Act

(Sec. 4) This bill requires open government data assets made available by federal agencies (excluding the Government Accountability Office [GAO] and certain other government entities) to be published as machine-readable data. When not otherwise prohibited by law, and to the extent practicable, public data assets and nonpublic data assets maintained by the federal government must be available: (1) in an open format that does not impede use or reuse and that has standards maintained by a standards organization; and (2) under open licenses with a legal guarantee that the data be available at no cost to the public with no restrictions on copying, publishing, distributing, transmitting, citing, or adapting.

If published government data assets are not available under an open license, the data must be considered part of the worldwide public domain. Agencies may engage with outside organizations and citizens to leverage public data assets for innovation in public and private sectors.

Agencies must: (1) make their enterprise data inventories available to the public on Data.gov, and (2) designate a point of contact to assist the public and respond to complaints about adherence to open data requirements. For privacy, security, confidentiality, or regulatory reasons, agencies may maintain a nonpublic portion of their inventories.

The General Services Administration must maintain a single public interface online as a point of entry dedicated to sharing open government data with the public.

(Sec. 5) The Chief Operating Officer of each agency shall submit to Congress and to the Office of Management and Budget (OMB) a report assessing the coverage, quality, methods, effectiveness, and independence of the evaluation, research, and analysis efforts of the agency.

The GAO shall submit to Congress a report that summarizes agency findings and highlights trends from the reports submitted and, if appropriate, recommends actions to further improve agency capacity to use evaluation techniques and data to support evaluation efforts.

(Sec. 6) The OMB must develop and maintain an online repository of tools, best practices, and schema standards to facilitate the adoption of open data practices.