There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (11)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

NIST Small Business Cybersecurity Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

NIST Small Business Cybersecurity Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

MAIN STREET Cybersecurity Act of 2017
Making Available Information Now to Strengthen Trust and Resilience and Enhance Enterprise Technology Cybersecurity Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

MAIN STREET Cybersecurity Act of 2017
Making Available Information Now to Strengthen Trust and Resilience and Enhance Enterprise Technology Cybersecurity Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

MAIN STREET Cybersecurity Act of 2017
Making Available Information Now to Strengthen Trust and Resilience and Enhance Enterprise Technology Cybersecurity Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To require the Director of the National Institute of Standards and Technology to disseminate guidance to help reduce small business cybersecurity risks, and for other purposes.

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Amended by Senate

An Act to require the Director of the National Institute of Standards and Technology to disseminate guidance to help reduce small business cybersecurity risks, and for other purposes.

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require the Director of the National Institute of Standards and Technology to disseminate resources to help reduce small business cybersecurity risks, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
08/14/2018Became Public Law No: 115-236.
08/14/2018Signed by President.
08/03/2018Presented to President.
08/01/2018Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to the House amendments to S. 770 by Unanimous Consent.(text as Senate agree to the House amendment: CR S5561)
07/25/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H7201)
09/28/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S6233)
09/11/2017Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-153.
03/29/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (26)

Date Chamber
08/14/2018Became Public Law No: 115-236.
08/14/2018Signed by President.
08/03/2018SenatePresented to President.
08/02/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/01/2018SenateSenate agreed to the House amendments to S. 770 by Unanimous Consent. (text as Senate agree to the House amendment: CR S5561)
07/26/2018SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
07/25/2018-2:25pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
07/25/2018-2:25pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/25/2018-2:25pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H7201)
07/25/2018-2:25pmHouseH.Amdt.951 On agreeing to the Webster (FL) amendment (A001) Agreed to by voice vote.
07/25/2018-2:24pmHouseH.Amdt.951 Amendment (A001) in the nature of a substitute offered by Mr. Webster (FL). (consideration: CR H7201-7202; text: CR H7201-7202)
07/25/2018-2:24pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H7201-7202)
07/25/2018-2:23pmHouseMr. Webster (FL) asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
04/25/2018SenateCommittee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-300.
10/02/2017-4:51pmHouseHeld at the desk.
10/02/2017-2:04pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/29/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/28/2017SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6233)
09/28/2017SenateThe committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent.
09/28/2017SenateS.Amdt.977 Amendment SA 977 as modified agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
09/28/2017SenateS.Amdt.977 Amendment SA 977 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Schatz. (consideration: CR S6232-6233; text as modified: CR S6233) To improve the bill.
09/28/2017SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6232-6233)
09/11/2017SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 217.
09/11/2017SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-153.
04/05/2017SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
03/29/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation03/29/2017 Referred to
04/05/2017 Markup by
09/11/2017 Reported by S. Rept. 115-153
Senate Small Business and Entrepreneurship04/25/2018 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (6)

There are 6 summaries for S.770. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-236 (08/14/2018)


NIST Small Business Cybersecurity Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the National Institute of Standards and Technology Act to require the National Institute of Standards and Technology (NIST) to consider small businesses when it facilitates and supports the development of voluntary, consensus-based, industry-led guidelines and procedures to cost-effectively reduce cyber risks to critical infrastructure.

NIST must disseminate, and publish on its website, standard and method resources that small business may use voluntarily to help identify, assess, manage, and reduce their cybersecurity risks. The resources must be: (1) technology-neutral, (2) based on international standards to the extent possible, (3) able to vary with the nature and size of the implementing small business and the sensitivity of the data collected or stored on the information systems, and (4) consistent with the national cybersecurity awareness and education program under the Cybersecurity Enhancement Act of 2014. Additionally, the resources must include case studies of practical application.

Other federal agencies may also elect to publish the resources on their own websites.