There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Ashlynne Mike AMBER Alert in Indian Country Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Ashlynne Mike AMBER Alert in Indian Country Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

AMBER Alert in Indian Country Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

AMBER Alert in Indian Country Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

AMBER Alert in Indian Country Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the PROTECT Act to make Indian tribes eligible for AMBER Alert grants.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
04/13/2018Became Public Law No: 115-166. (TXT | PDF)
04/13/2018Signed by President.
04/02/2018Presented to President.
03/22/2018Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to the House amendment to S. 772 by Unanimous Consent.
02/26/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H1233)
11/29/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7498; text: CR S7498)
09/05/2017Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 115-147.
03/29/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber
04/13/2018Became Public Law No: 115-166. (TXT | PDF)
04/13/2018Signed by President.
04/02/2018SenatePresented to President.
03/23/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/22/2018SenateSenate agreed to the House amendment to S. 772 by Unanimous Consent.
02/27/2018SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
02/26/2018-4:58pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/26/2018-4:58pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1233)
02/26/2018-4:48pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 772.
02/26/2018-4:48pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1233-1234)
02/26/2018-4:48pmHouseMr. Biggs moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
11/30/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
11/30/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/30/2017-2:55pmHouseReceived in the House.
11/29/2017SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7498; text: CR S7498)
09/05/2017SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 209.
09/05/2017SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 115-147.
06/13/2017SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
03/29/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 05/08/2017
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 05/10/2017
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 05/10/2017
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/16/2017
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/14/2017
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 07/10/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Indian Affairs03/29/2017 Referred to
06/13/2017 Markup by
09/05/2017 Reported by S. Rept. 115-147
House Judiciary11/30/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.772. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-166 (04/13/2018)

Ashlynne Mike AMBER Alert in Indian Country Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the PROTECT Act to reauthorize the AMBER Alert grant program for FY2019.

The bill also modifies the program to:

  • add, as a new purpose area, the integration of tribal AMBER Alert systems into state AMBER alert systems;
  • make Indian tribes eligible for AMBER Alert grants;
  • permit the use of grant funds to integrate state or regional AMBER Alert communication plans with an Indian tribe; and
  • allow the waiver of the matching funds requirement for grants awarded to Indian tribes.

(Sec. 3) The Department of Justice must submit to Congress a report evaluating the readiness, education, and training needs, technological challenges, and specific obstacles encountered by Indian tribes in the integration of state or regional AMBER Alert communication plans.