There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (13)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

PROTECT Our Children Act of 2017
Providing Resources, Officers, and Technology To Eradicate Cyber Threats to Our Children Act of 2017

Other Short Titles

PROTECT Our Children Act of 2017
Providing Resources, Officers, and Technology To Eradicate Cyber Threats to Our Children Act of 2017

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

PROTECT Our Children Act of 2017
Providing Resources, Officers, and Technology To Eradicate Cyber Threats to Our Children Act of 2017

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

PROTECT Our Children Act of 2017
Providing Resources, Officers, and Technology To Eradicate Cyber Threats to Our Children Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

PROTECT Our Children Act of 2017
Providing Resources, Officers, and Technology To Eradicate Cyber Threats to Our Children Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

PROTECT Our Children Act of 2017
Providing Resources, Officers, and Technology To Eradicate Cyber Threats to Our Children Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to reauthorize the National Internet Crimes Against Children Task Force Program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
11/02/2017Became Public Law No: 115-82. (TXT | PDF)
11/02/2017Signed by President.
11/02/2017Presented to President.
10/26/2017Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to the House amendment to the Senate bill by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6859)
10/03/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 417 - 3 (Roll no. 550).(text: CR H7706)
06/15/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S3547-3548; text: CR S3548)
06/08/2017Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley without amendment. Without written report.
03/30/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber
11/02/2017Became Public Law No: 115-82. (TXT | PDF)
11/02/2017Signed by President.
11/02/2017SenatePresented to President.
10/27/2017-10:29amHousePursuant to the provisions of S. Con. Res. 28, enrollment corrections on S. 782 have been made.
10/27/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/26/2017SenateSenate agreed to the House amendment to the Senate bill by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6859)
10/04/2017SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
10/03/2017-6:10pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/03/2017-6:10pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 417 - 3 (Roll no. 550). (text: CR H7706)
10/03/2017-6:03pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7728)
10/03/2017-3:46pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
10/03/2017-3:23pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 782.
10/03/2017-3:23pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7706-7709)
10/03/2017-3:23pmHouseMr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/20/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
06/20/2017-2:02pmHouseReceived in the House.
06/19/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/15/2017SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3547-3548; text: CR S3548)
06/08/2017SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 122.
06/08/2017SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley without amendment. Without written report.
06/08/2017SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
03/30/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2154)

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary03/30/2017 Referred to
06/08/2017 Markup by
06/08/2017 Reported by
House Judiciary06/20/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (6)

There are 6 summaries for S.782. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-82 (11/02/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on October 3, 2017. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Providing Resources, Officers, and Technology To Eradicate Cyber Threats to Our Children Act of 2017 or the PROTECT Our Children Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the PROTECT our Children Act of 2008 to reauthorize through FY2022 the National Strategy for Child Exploitation Prevention and Interdiction.