There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Securing Energy Infrastructure Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Securing Energy Infrastructure Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Securing Energy Infrastructure Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for the establishment of a pilot program to identify security vulnerabilities of certain entities in the energy sector.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
12/20/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
05/10/2018Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-246.
01/10/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber
12/20/2018-8:30pmHouseHeld at the desk.
12/20/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/20/2018-12:42pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/20/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
05/10/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 410.
05/10/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-246.
03/08/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
03/28/2017SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 115-262.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy
01/10/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 01/10/2017
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM]* 01/10/2017
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 01/10/2017
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 01/10/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources01/10/2017 Referred to
03/08/2018 Markup by
05/10/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-246
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy03/28/2017 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.79. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/10/2017)

Securing Energy Infrastructure Act

This bill establishes a two-year pilot program within the Department of Energy's (DOE) national laboratories to identify the security vulnerabilities of certain entities in the energy sector, and research and test technology that can be used to isolate the most critical systems of such entities from cyber-attacks.

In addition, DOE must establish a working group to evaluate the technology solutions proposed by the national laboratories and to develop a national cyber strategy to isolate the energy grid from attacks.

DOE must also submit a report to Congress describing the results of the pilot program, assessing the feasibility of the techniques considered, and outlining the results of the working group's evaluation.