There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Shark Fin Trade Elimination Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Shark Fin Trade Elimination Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to prohibit sale of shark fins, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
11/27/2018Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-388.
03/30/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date
11/27/2018Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 675.
Action By: Senate
11/27/2018Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-388.
Action By: Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation
05/18/2017Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Action By: Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation
03/30/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (39)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV]* 03/30/2017
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 03/30/2017
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 03/30/2017
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI]* 03/30/2017
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 03/30/2017
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 03/30/2017
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 03/30/2017
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 03/30/2017
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 03/30/2017
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI]* 03/30/2017
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 10/30/2017
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 10/30/2017
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 10/30/2017
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 10/30/2017
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 10/30/2017
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 10/30/2017
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 10/30/2017
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 10/30/2017
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 10/31/2017
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 11/09/2017
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 11/09/2017
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA] 11/16/2017
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 11/28/2017
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 12/12/2017
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 12/12/2017
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 12/12/2017
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 12/19/2017
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 12/19/2017
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 12/19/2017
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 12/21/2017
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 01/16/2018
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 02/27/2018
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 05/16/2018
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/17/2018
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 09/17/2018
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 09/18/2018
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 09/28/2018
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 09/28/2018
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 10/02/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation03/30/2017 Referred to
05/18/2017 Markup by
11/27/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-388

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.793. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (11/27/2018)

Shark Fin Trade Elimination Act of 2017

This bill makes it illegal to possess, buy, sell, or transport shark fins or any product containing shark fins, except for certain dogfish fins. A person may possess a shark fin that was lawfully taken consistent with a license or permit under certain circumstances.

Penalties are imposed for violations under the Magnuson-Stevens Fishery Conservation and Management Act. The maximum civil penalty for each violation shall be $100,000, or the fair market value of the shark fins involved, whichever is greater.