There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to facilitate construction of a bridge on certain property in Christian County, Missouri, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
10/06/2017Became Public Law No: 115-67. (TXT | PDF)
10/06/2017Signed by President.
09/28/2017Presented to President.
09/25/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7456-7457)
08/03/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S4892; text: CR S4892)
08/02/2017Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-142.
04/04/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
10/06/2017Became Public Law No: 115-67. (TXT | PDF)
10/06/2017Signed by President.
09/28/2017SenatePresented to President.
09/25/2017-4:58pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/25/2017-4:58pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7456-7457)
09/25/2017-4:54pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 810.
09/25/2017-4:54pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7456-7457)
09/25/2017-4:54pmHouseMr. Ferguson moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
08/07/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
08/07/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
08/04/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
08/04/2017-1:06pmHouseReceived in the House.
08/04/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/03/2017SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4892; text: CR S4892)
08/02/2017SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 192.
08/02/2017SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-142.
07/12/2017SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
04/04/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 04/04/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Environment and Public Works04/04/2017 Referred to
07/12/2017 Markup by
08/02/2017 Reported by S. Rept. 115-142
House Transportation and Infrastructure08/04/2017 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Highways and Transit08/07/2017 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation08/07/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.810. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-67 (10/06/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the Senate on August 2, 2017. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

(Sec. 1) This bill authorizes the Riverside Bridge Project, to construct, maintain, and operate a bridge on certain property conveyed to Christian County, Missouri, by the Riverside Inn, Inc.

As a condition for such authorization, the county or an assignee shall:

  • carry out the project in a manner that ensures that no attributable flood damage occurs, and
  • be liable for any such damage that does occur.

The government shall not be liable for future flood damage that is caused by the project.

No future federal disaster assistance may be provided with respect to the project.