There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

ABLE to Work Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to allow individuals with disabilities to save additional amounts in their ABLE accounts above the current annual maximum contribution if they work and earn income.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/04/2017 Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
04/04/2017 Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 04/04/2017
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD]* 04/04/2017
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 04/04/2017
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/05/2017
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR] 04/06/2017
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 05/22/2017
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 09/05/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance04/04/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (6)

  • Bank accounts, deposits, capital
  • Disability and paralysis
  • Employee benefits and pensions
  • Income tax credits
  • Income tax exclusion

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.818. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (04/04/2017)

ABLE to Work Act of 2017

This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code, with respect to ABLE accounts (tax-exempt savings accounts for persons with a disability), to allow: (1) an ABLE account beneficiary to make additional contributions to an ABLE account equal to the lesser of such beneficiary's compensation or an amount equal to the federal poverty line for a one-person household, and (2) a retirement savings tax credit for contributions to an ABLE account.