There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Paycheck Fairness Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 to provide more effective remedies to victims of discrimination in the payment of wages on the basis of sex, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/04/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
04/04/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (48)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 04/04/2017
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 04/04/2017
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 04/04/2017
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 04/04/2017
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 04/04/2017
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 04/04/2017
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 04/04/2017
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 04/04/2017
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD]* 04/04/2017
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 04/04/2017
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 04/04/2017
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 04/04/2017
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 04/04/2017
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 04/04/2017
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 04/04/2017
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 04/04/2017
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM]* 04/04/2017
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 04/04/2017
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 04/04/2017
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ]* 04/04/2017
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 04/04/2017
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 04/04/2017
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 04/04/2017
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 04/04/2017
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 04/04/2017
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 04/04/2017
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 04/04/2017
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 04/04/2017
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 04/04/2017
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 04/04/2017
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA]* 04/04/2017
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT]* 04/04/2017
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 04/04/2017
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 04/04/2017
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA]* 04/04/2017
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH]* 04/04/2017
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 04/04/2017
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 04/04/2017
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL]* 04/04/2017
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 04/04/2017
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 04/26/2017
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 05/02/2017
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 07/10/2017
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 09/14/2017
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 09/19/2017
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 01/10/2018
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 01/30/2018
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 02/07/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions04/04/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.819. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (04/04/2017)

Paycheck Fairness Act

This bill amends equal pay provisions of the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 to: (1) restrict the use of the bona fide factor defense to wage discrimination claims, (2) enhance nonretaliation provisions, (3) make it unlawful to require an employee to sign a contract or waiver prohibiting the employee from disclosing information about the employee's wages, and (4) increase civil penalties for violations of equal pay provisions.

The Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (EEOC) and the Office of Federal Contract Compliance Programs shall train EEOC employees and other affected parties on wage discrimination matters.

The bill directs the Department of Labor to: (1) establish and carry out a grant program for negotiation skills training for girls and women, (2) conduct studies to eliminate pay disparities between men and women, and (3) make available information on wage discrimination to assist the public in understanding and addressing such discrimination.

The Secretary of Labor's National Award for Pay Equity in the Workplace is established for an employer who has made a substantial effort to eliminate pay disparities between men and women.

This bill amends the Civil Rights Act of 1964 to require the EEOC to issue regulations for collecting from employers compensation and other employment data according to sex, race, and national origin of employees for use in enforcing laws prohibiting pay discrimination.