There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Stop Subsidizing Multimillion Dollar Corporate Bonuses Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to expand the denial of deduction for certain excessive employee remuneration, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/10/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
01/10/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S206-207)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 01/10/2017
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 01/11/2017
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 02/01/2017
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 02/15/2017
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 02/15/2017
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 03/15/2017
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 09/07/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Finance01/10/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.82. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/10/2017)

Stop Subsidizing Multimillion Dollar Corporate Bonuses Act

This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code, with respect to the $1 million limitation on the deductibility of employee compensation, to: (1) extend such limitation to any individual who is a current or former officer, director, or employee of a publicly-held corporation; (2) eliminate the exemption from such limitation for compensation payable on a commission basis or upon the attainment of a performance goal; and (3) make such limitation applicable to all publicly-held corporations that are required by the Securities and Exchange Commission to register securities and provide periodic reports to their investors.